Clark v. Smith Rouchon and Associates Inc
Plaintiff: Gregory Clark
Defendant: Smith Rouchon and Associates Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv01123
Filed: July 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #20 Motion for Extension of Time. The court GRANTS Plaintiffs motion and EXTENDS the time for Plaintiff to file a response to Defendants motion to October 8, 2019. Defendant shall file any response by October 15, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 9/13/19. (BJL)
September 13, 2019 Filing 20 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings/Summary Judgment Motion is RIPE 9/13/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Gregory Clark. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Philipps, David)
September 5, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE by Smith Rouchon and Associates Inc Certification to Court by William V. Westbrook, III (Westbrook, William)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by William V. Westbrook, III. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 9/4/19. (BJL)
September 3, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3425689 (receipt number B4601100286). (Westbrook, William) Modified on 9/4/2019 (BJL).
September 3, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Motion is RIPE 9/3/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Smith Rouchon and Associates Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Declaration of Randi P. Mueller)(Westbrook, William)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: the parties are hereby notified that, unless they unanimously consent to the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge by no later than October 14, 2019, the case will be reassigned to a randomly-drawn district judge for all purposes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 9/3/19. (BJL)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER setting Telephone Conference for 9/27/2019 at 10:45 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 9/3/19. (BJL)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Defendant filed a Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. (Doc. 12). Plaintiff shall file a response within fourteen (14) days from the entry date of this order. Defendant shall file a reply, if any, within seven (7) days of Plaintiffs response. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 9/3/19. (BJL)
August 29, 2019 Filing 13 Brief re #12 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings or for a Summary Judgment filed by Smith Rouchon and Associates Inc. (Mueller, Randi)
August 29, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings or for a Summary Judgment by Smith Rouchon and Associates Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A DUPP of DIANNE DIXON)(Mueller, Randi)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings. Defendant's answer or responsive pleading is due August 30, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 8/9/2019. (LMC, )
August 9, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings Motion is RIPE 8/9/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Smith Rouchon and Associates Inc. (Mueller, Randi)
August 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Randi Peresich Mueller on behalf of Smith Rouchon and Associates Inc (Mueller, Randi)
July 29, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed Smith Rouchon and Associates Inc served on 7/25/2019, answer due 8/15/2019. (BJL)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Smith Rouchon and Associates Inc by Clerk for service by certified mail. (BJL)
July 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave for David J. Philipps and Mary E. Philipps to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 7/18/2019. (LMC, )
July 17, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3392518 (B4601099212). (Philipps, David)
July 17, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3392515 (b4601099213). (Philipps, David)
July 17, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3392513 (b4601099211). related document #1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Smith Rouchon and Associates Inc filed by Gregory Clark. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(BJL). (Philipps, David)
July 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald C Sykstus on behalf of Gregory Clark (Sykstus, Ronald)
July 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL)
July 17, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Motion is RIPE 7/17/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Gregory Clark. (BJL)
July 17, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Gregory Clark. (BJL)
July 17, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Smith Rouchon and Associates Inc filed by Gregory Clark. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(BJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. Smith Rouchon and Associates Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gregory Clark
Represented By: Ronald C Sykstus
Represented By: David J. Philipps
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Philipps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith Rouchon and Associates Inc
Represented By: Randi Peresich Mueller
Represented By: William V Westbrook, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?