Fame Enterprises Inc v. West et al
Plaintiff: Fame Enterprises Inc
Defendant: Terrence Thornton, UMG Recordings Inc, Pusha-T, Def Jam Recordings, Getting Out Our Dreams Inc, Universal Music Group and Kanye West
Case Number: 3:2019cv01302
Filed: August 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AGREED ORDER: The First Amended Complaint is permitted; and Defendants UMG and GOOD Music shall move, answer, or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint on or before October 31, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 10/9/19. (BJL)
October 9, 2019 Filing 6 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Fame Enterprises Inc. filed by Fame Enterprises Inc (Hall, G)
October 9, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION entry of agreed order by Fame Enterprises Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Unopposed Motion for Entry of Agreed Order)(Hall, G) Modified on 10/9/2019 (BJL).
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - plaintiff is ORDERED to show cause within 7 days from the entry date of this order why this court should not strike the Amended Complaint as more fully set out in order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 10/3/2019. (AHI)
September 10, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3430993 (receipt number B4601100521). related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with JURY DEMAND by Getting Out Our Dreams Inc from The Circuit Court of Colbert County, Alabama, case number 20-CV-2019-900154. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit 1)(BJL). (O'Rear, Howell) Modified on 9/11/2019 (BJL).
September 9, 2019 Filing 3 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Fame Enterprises Inc.(Hargett, Douglas)
August 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL)
August 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with JURY DEMAND by Getting Out Our Dreams Inc from The Circuit Court of Colbert County, Alabama, case number 20-CV-2019-900154. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(BJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fame Enterprises Inc v. West et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terrence Thornton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UMG Recordings Inc
Represented By: Howell Griffith O'Rear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pusha-T
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Def Jam Recordings
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Getting Out Our Dreams Inc
Represented By: Howell Griffith O'Rear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Universal Music Group
Represented By: Howell Griffith O'Rear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kanye West
Represented By: Howell Griffith O'Rear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fame Enterprises Inc
Represented By: J Michael Tanner
Represented By: G Rick Hall
Represented By: Douglas B Hargett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?