Charles v. Smith Rouchon and Associates Inc
Plaintiff: William Charles
Defendant: Smith Rouchon and Associates Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv01326
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 1, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE by Smith Rouchon and Associates Inc Certification to Court by William V. Westbrook, III (Westbrook, William)
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 TEXT ORDER granting #12 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of William V. Westbrook. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 9/23/19. (LBG, )
September 23, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3440082 (receipt number B4601100779). (Westbrook, William) Modified on 9/25/2019 (BJL).
September 23, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Motion is RIPE 9/23/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Smith Rouchon and Associates Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Declaration of Randi P. Mueller)(Westbrook, William)
September 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant shall file an answer or responsive pleading by October 23, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 9/19/19. (LBG, )
September 19, 2019 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleadings Motion is RIPE 9/19/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Smith Rouchon and Associates Inc. (Mueller, Randi)
September 19, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Randi Peresich Mueller on behalf of Smith Rouchon and Associates Inc (Mueller, Randi)
September 11, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed as to Smith Rouchon and Associates. No delivery date on green card. (BJL)
August 28, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Smith Rouchon and Associates Inc by Clerk for service via certified mail. (BJL)
August 26, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald C Sykstus on behalf of William Charles (Sykstus, Ronald)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of David J. Philipps and Mary E. Philipps. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 8/16/19. (LBG, )
August 16, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3413843 (receipt number B4601099939). (Philipps, David) Modified on 8/19/2019 (BJL).
August 16, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3413816 (receipt number B4601099938). (Philipps, David) Modified on 8/19/2019 (BJL).
August 16, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3413808 (receipt number B4601099937). related document #1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Smith Rouchon and Associates Inc filed by William Charles. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(BJL). (Philipps, David) Modified on 8/19/2019 (BJL).
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 Request for service by certified mail filed by William Charles. (BJL)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David J. Philipps and Mary E. Philipps Motion is RIPE 8/16/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by William Charles. (BJL)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Smith Rouchon and Associates Inc filed by William Charles. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(BJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Charles v. Smith Rouchon and Associates Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Charles
Represented By: Ronald C Sykstus
Represented By: David J. Philipps
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Philipps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith Rouchon and Associates Inc
Represented By: Randi Peresich Mueller
Represented By: William V Westbrook, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?