Beyersdorf v. Frost-Arnett Company
Plaintiff: Jennifer Beyersdorf
Defendant: Frost-Arnett Company
Case Number: 3:2019cv01351
Filed: August 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER DISMISSING CASE: Pursuant to Plaintiffs Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, it is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that this case is DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, with each party to bear its own fees and costs.Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 9/30/19. (BJL)
September 27, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Jennifer Beyersdorf (Philipps, David)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER STAYING CASE: The parties shall take appropriate action to perfect settlement by October 31, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 9/12/19. (BJL)
September 11, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by Jennifer Beyersdorf (Philipps, David)
September 3, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed Frost-Arnett Company served on 8/28/2019, answer due 9/18/2019. (BJL)
August 26, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Frost-Arnett Company by Clerk for service via certified mail. (BJL)
August 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David J. Philipps and Mary E. Philipps. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 8/22/2019. (LMC, )
August 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald C Sykstus on behalf of Jennifer Beyersdorf (Sykstus, Ronald)
August 20, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3415890 (receipt number B4601100017). (Philipps, David) Modified on 8/21/2019 (BJL).
August 20, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3415887 (receipt number B4601100018). (Philipps, David) Modified on 8/21/2019 (BJL).
August 20, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3415885 (receipt number B4601100016). related document #1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Frost-Arnett Company filed by Jennifer Beyersdorf. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(BJL). (Philipps, David) Modified on 8/21/2019 (BJL).
August 20, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL)
August 20, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by David J. Philipps and Mary E. Philipps Motion is RIPE 8/20/2019. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Jennifer Beyersdorf. (BJL)
August 20, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Jennifer Beyersdorf. (BJL)
August 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Frost-Arnett Company filed by Jennifer Beyersdorf. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(BJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beyersdorf v. Frost-Arnett Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frost-Arnett Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Beyersdorf
Represented By: Ronald C Sykstus
Represented By: David J. Philipps
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Philipps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?