Calhoun v. Fox Collection Center
Plaintiff: Denese Calhoun
Defendant: Fox Collection Center
Case Number: 3:2019cv01468
Filed: September 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Liles C Burke
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DISMISSING CASE that pursuant to the stipulation of dismissal it is ORDERED that all claims embraced herein are DISMISSED WITH PREJDUICE and costs are taxed as paid. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 10/15/2019. (AHI)
October 14, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Denese Calhoun (Philipps, David)
September 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that the court having been notified that a settlement has been reached, GRANTED plaintiff's request that this case be STAYED; therefore, this case is STAYED until 11/7/2019, at which time the plaintiff shall file for dismissal or otherwise notify the Court of the status of the case. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 9/24/2019. (AHI)
September 23, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Settlement by Denese Calhoun (Philipps, David)
September 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Admission pro hac vice. David J. Philipps and Mary E. Philipps are hereby admitted pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 9/18/2019. (CT)
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Fox Collection Center served on 9/12/2019, answer due 10/3/2019. (BJL)
September 9, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued by the clerk and delivered via certified mail for service as to Fox Collection Center. (AHI)
September 5, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald C Sykstus on behalf of Denese Calhoun (Sykstus, Ronald)
September 4, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3427266 (B4601100378). (Philipps, David)
September 4, 2019 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3427262 (B4601100377). (Philipps, David)
September 4, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3427249 (B4601100372). related document #1 COMPLAINT with jury demand therein against Fox Collection Center filed by Denese Calhoun. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C)(AHI). (Philipps, David)
September 4, 2019 Filing 3 Request for service by certified mail filed by Denese Calhoun. (AHI)
September 4, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Appear PHV by David Philipps and Mary Philipps by Denese Calhoun. (AHI)
September 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with jury demand therein against Fox Collection Center filed by Denese Calhoun. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(AHI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Calhoun v. Fox Collection Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fox Collection Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denese Calhoun
Represented By: Ronald C Sykstus
Represented By: David J. Philipps
Represented By: Mary Elizabeth Philipps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?