U.S. Commodity Futures Trading Commission v. Butler et al
Plaintiff: U.S. Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Defendant: Negus Capital Incorporated and Aaron B. Butler
Case Number: 3:2019cv01792
Filed: November 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Liles C Burke
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The deadline for the defendants to file their answers or other responsive pleadings is hereby extended to January 17, 2020. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 12/05/2019. (KBW)
December 3, 2019 Filing 5 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint for Pro Se Litigant Defendant Aaron B. Butler in His Individual Capacity by U.S. Commodity Futures Trading Commission. (Deacon, James)
November 14, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by U.S. Commodity Futures Trading Commission. Negus Capital Incorporated served on 11/12/2019, answer due 12/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Proof of Service - Affidavit of Service)(Deacon, James)
November 14, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by U.S. Commodity Futures Trading Commission. Aaron B. Butler served on 11/12/2019, answer due 12/3/2019. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 to Proof of Service - Affidavit of Service)(Deacon, James)
November 7, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Aaron B. Butler and Negus Capital Incorporated by Clerk and delivered to courier for Plaintiff's attorney for service. (BJL)
November 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Aaron B. Butler and Negus Capital Incorporated filed by U.S. Commodity Futures Trading Commission.(AHI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: U.S. Commodity Futures Trading Commission v. Butler et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Negus Capital Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aaron B. Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: U.S. Commodity Futures Trading Commission
Represented By: James White Deacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?