Burney v. Greenway Automotive Inc et al
Plaintiff: Tina Burney
Defendant: University Chevrolet of Tuscumbia and Greenway Automotive Inc
Case Number: 3:2019cv02081
Filed: December 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Defendants filed Motions for Leave for Tillman Y. Coffey and John W. Stapleton to Appear Pro Hac Vice. After review of the application, the court GRANTS the motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 2/10/20. (BJL)
February 7, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Leave to Appear Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for John W. Stapleton Motion is RIPE 2/7/2020. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Greenway Automotive Inc, University Chevrolet of Tuscumbia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Coffey, Tillman)
February 7, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Leave to Appear Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Tillman Y. Coffey Motion is RIPE 2/7/2020. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Greenway Automotive Inc, University Chevrolet of Tuscumbia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Coffey, Tillman)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants Greenway Automotive, Inc. and University Chevrolet of Tuscumbia shall file answers or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint by February 20, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on January 28, 2020. (HKM)
January 28, 2020 Filing 7 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Defendants' Consent Motion to Extend the Deadline to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint Motion is RIPE 1/28/2020. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Greenway Automotive Inc, University Chevrolet of Tuscumbia. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Stapleton, John)
January 21, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Greenway Automotive Inc served on 1/13/2020, answer due 2/3/2020. (AHI)
January 10, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed - University Chevrolet of Tuscumbia served on 1/9/2020, answer due 1/30/2020. (BJL)
January 6, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Greenway Automotive Inc and University Chevrolet of Tuscumbia by Clerk for service via certified mail. (BJL)
December 23, 2019 Filing 3 Request for service by certified mail filed by Tina Burney. (Porter, Adam)
December 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL)
December 23, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3501947. (B4601102874) related document #1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Greenway Automotive Inc and University Chevrolet of Tuscumbia filed by Tina Burney.(BJL). (Porter, Adam) Modified on 12/26/2019 (AHI).
December 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Greenway Automotive Inc and University Chevrolet of Tuscumbia filed by Tina Burney.(BJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burney v. Greenway Automotive Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tina Burney
Represented By: Adam M Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: University Chevrolet of Tuscumbia
Represented By: John W Stapleton
Represented By: Tillman Y Coffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greenway Automotive Inc
Represented By: John W Stapleton
Represented By: Tillman Y Coffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?