Phillips v. Radius Global Solutions LLC
Plaintiff: Ruth Phillips
Defendant: Radius Global Solutions LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00089
Filed: January 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Liles C Burke
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER DISMISSING CASE: Pursuant to the voluntary dismissal without prejudice notice filed by the plaintiff the clerk of court is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 3/10/2020. (AHI)
March 6, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Ruth Phillips (Philipps, David)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time. The deadline for the defendant to file a responsive pleading is extended to March 10, 2020. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 3/3/2020. (KBW)
March 3, 2020 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File First Responsive Pleading by Radius Global Solutions LLC. (Nettles, Laura)
February 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time; granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Radius Global Solutions LLC answer due 3/3/2020.. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 2/19/2020. (KBW)
February 18, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time , MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Radius Global Solutions LLC. (Nettles, Laura)
January 31, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed Radius Global Solutions LLC served on 1/27/2020, answer due 2/17/2020. (AHI)
January 23, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued by the clerk and delivered via certified mail for service as to Radius Global Solutions LLC. (AHI)
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Appear pro hac vice. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 1/21/2020. (KBW)
January 20, 2020 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3517921 (B4601103471). (Philipps, David) Modified on 1/22/2020 (AHI).
January 20, 2020 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number 1126-3517920 (B4601103470). (Philipps, David) Modified on 1/22/2020 (AHI).
January 20, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3517919 (b4601103469). related document #1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Radius Global Solutions LLC filed by Ruth Phillips. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(BJL). (Philipps, David) Modified on 1/22/2020 (AHI).
January 20, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Ronald C Sykstus on behalf of Ruth Phillips (Sykstus, Ronald)
January 17, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for David J. Philipps and Mary E. Philipps by Ruth Phillips. (BJL)
January 17, 2020 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Ruth Phillips. (BJL)
January 17, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Radius Global Solutions LLC filed by Ruth Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(BJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phillips v. Radius Global Solutions LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Radius Global Solutions LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth Phillips
Represented By: Ronald C Sykstus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?