Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. v. S & T Properties LLC
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Defendant: S & T Properties LLC
Case Number: 3:2020cv00498
Filed: April 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: the court ORDERS Plaintiff to file a supplemental status report within forty-five (45) days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 6/3/20. (BJL)
June 2, 2020 Filing 7 STATUS REPORT by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (Reeves, T)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Defendant has not filed an Answer or other responsive pleading. Accordingly, the court ORDERS Plaintiff to file a status report, or take other appropriate action, within fourteen days of the date of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 5/20/20. (BJL)
April 27, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed S & T Properties LLC served on 4/21/2020, answer due 5/12/2020. (AHI)
April 16, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to S & T Properties LLC by Clerk for service via certified mail. (BJL)
April 15, 2020 Filing 3 Request for service by certified mail filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Reeves, T)
April 14, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3572739 (receipt number B4601105396). related document #1 COMPLAINT against S & T Properties LLC filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..(BJL). (Reeves, T) Modified on 4/16/2020 (BJL).
April 14, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL)
April 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against S & T Properties LLC filed by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A..(BJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. v. S & T Properties LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S & T Properties LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: T Dylan Reeves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?