Vaughn v. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The
Plaintiff: Dallas Vaughn
Defendant: Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The
Case Number: 3:2020cv00578
Filed: April 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Liles C Burke
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1441eri
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 11, 2020 Filing 5 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Walters, Jason)
May 6, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The.(Walters, Jason)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 4/30/2020. (AHI)
April 28, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3580070 (receipt number B4601105601). related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The from Circuit Court of Colbert County, Alabama, case number 20-cv-2020-900084 filed by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A)(AHI). (Walters, Jason) Modified on 4/29/2020 (BJL).
April 28, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The (AHI)
April 28, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The from Circuit Court of Colbert County, Alabama, case number 20-cv-2020-900084 filed by Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(AHI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vaughn v. Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln National Life Insurance Company, The
Represented By: Kriston Laney Gifford
Represented By: Jason A Walters
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dallas Vaughn
Represented By: R Willson Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?