Clark v. United Omaha Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Byron Clark
Defendant: United Omaha Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 3:2020cv00934
Filed: July 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 8/24/2020. (AHI )
August 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SCHEDULING ORDER: that certain time limits and deadlines apply as set out in this order; Discovery due by 1/29/2021; Dispositive Motions due by 3/5/2021; Trial ready on or after 5/1/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 8/24/2020. (AHI)
August 21, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by Byron Clark and United Omaha Life Insurance Company. (BJL)
August 17, 2020 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Johnson, John)
August 10, 2020 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr: Telephone Conference held on 8/10/2020. (SHB, )
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: the parties are hereby notified that, unless they unanimously consent to the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge by no later than August 24, 2020, the case will be reassigned to a randomly-drawn district judge for all purposes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 7/9/20. (BJL)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: The Court SETS a telephone status conference for 9:30 a.m. on Monday, August 10, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 7/9/20. (BJL)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 7/9/20. (BJL)
July 8, 2020 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by United Omaha Life Insurance Company.(Johnson, John)
July 2, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL)
July 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by United Omaha Life Insurance Company from The Circuit Court of Lauderdale County, Alabama, case number 41-CV-2020-900165. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(BJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Clark v. United Omaha Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Byron Clark
Represented By: R Willson Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Omaha Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Henry Tonsmeire Morrissette
Represented By: John S Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?