Brewer v. Freightcar Alabama LLC et al
Plaintiff: Matthew Brewer
Defendant: Freightcar Alabama LLC and MetLife Group, Inc.
Case Number: 3:2020cv01427
Filed: September 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12117 ad
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2020 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION to Dismiss and Incorporated Brief in Support Thereof Motion is RIPE 11/20/2020. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Matthew Brewer. (Evans, Daniel)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER REGARDING COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 26. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 11/16/20. (BJL)
November 16, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Freightcar Alabama LLC.(Coleman, John)
November 12, 2020 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by MetLife Group, Inc.. filed by MetLife Group, Inc. (Greggs, Mitchell)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: the parties are hereby notified that, unless they unanimously consent to the exercise of dispositive jurisdiction by a magistrate judge by no later than December 28, 2020, the case will be reassigned to a randomly-drawn district judge for all purposes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 11/12/20. (BJL)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: Telephone Conference set for 12/14/2020 at 09:00 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 11/12/20. (BJL)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Plaintiff shall file a response to Metropolitan Life Insurance Company's Motion to Dismiss within 14 days from the entry date of this order. Defendant shall file any reply within 7 days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 11/12/20. (BJL)
November 12, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Dismiss and Incorporated Brief in Support Thereof by MetLife Group, Inc.. (Greggs, Mitchell)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER granting #10 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant Freightcar Alabama LLC shall file a responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint by November 16, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on October 23, 2020. (HKM)
October 23, 2020 Filing 10 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint Motion is RIPE 10/23/2020. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Freightcar Alabama LLC. (Coleman, John)
October 23, 2020 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Freightcar Alabama LLC. filed by Freightcar Alabama LLC (Coleman, John)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant MetLife Group, Inc. shall file a responsive pleading to Plaintiff's Complaint by November 16, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on October 23, 2020. (HKM)
October 23, 2020 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading Motion is RIPE 10/23/2020. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by MetLife Group, Inc.. (Greggs, Mitchell)
October 13, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed - MetLife Group, Inc. served on 10/5/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (BJL)
October 9, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed - Freightcar Alabama LLC served on 10/5/2020, answer due 10/26/2020. (BJL)
September 29, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Freightcar Alabama LLC and MetLife Group, Inc. by Clerk for service via certified mail. (BJL)
September 28, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3681011 (B4601108721). related document #1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Matthew Brewer.(BJL). (Evans, Daniel) Modified on 9/29/2020 (BJL).
September 24, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial. (BJL)
September 24, 2020 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Matthew Brewer. (BJL)
September 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants filed by Matthew Brewer.(BJL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brewer v. Freightcar Alabama LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Freightcar Alabama LLC
Represented By: Meryl Lindsay Cowan
Represented By: John James Coleman, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MetLife Group, Inc.
Represented By: Mitchell David Greggs
Represented By: William B Wahlheim, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Brewer
Represented By: Daniel P Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?