Dillard v. Marshall et al
Petitioner: Edward Ray Dillard
Respondent: Steve Marshall and Chris Connolly
Case Number: 3:2021cv00809
Filed: June 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Referring Judge: John H England
2 Judge: Corey L Maze
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 TEXT ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Petitioner's traverse is due by September 5, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 8/3/2021. (CDG)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #5 Answer to Complaint, by Edward Ray Dillard. (Gardner, Bruce)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Bruce A Gardner on behalf of Edward Ray Dillard (Gardner, Bruce)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - On July 16, 2021, the respondents filed a response to the petition in the above-styled case in which they seek to have the petition summarily dismissed without an evidentiary hearing. (Doc. #5 ). This Order is to inform the petitioner of his right to file affidavits or other materials in opposition to the response and of the possible consequences of not responding. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 7/16/2021. (KEK)
July 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Respondents's ANSWER to Complaint by Steve Marshall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20)(Starrett, Marc)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Marc Starrett on behalf of Steve Marshall (Starrett, Marc)
June 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: This case is reassigned to Judge Annemarie Carney Axon. Judge Corey L Maze no longer assigned to the case. (KAM)
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE Accordingly, it is ORDERED that the respondents appear and show cause in writing within thirty (30) days, why the relief requested by the petitioner should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 6/16/2021. (SRD)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Edward Ray Dillard. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16) (MEB2)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing fee: $ 5.00, receipt number H4601004831 (MEB2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dillard v. Marshall et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Steve Marshall
Represented By: Marc Starrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chris Connolly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Edward Ray Dillard
Represented By: Bruce A Gardner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?