DeVaughn v. Sheffield, Alabama, City of et al
Plaintiff: Sebastian DeVaughn
Defendant: Sheffield, Alabama, City of, Ricky Terry, Drake Seal, Amos Rowell, Campbell and Max Dotson
Case Number: 3:2021cv01086
Filed: August 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Plaintiff to respond to the Motion to Dismiss within 14 days; Defendants may reply within 7 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 9/28/21. (BJL)
September 27, 2021 Filing 17 Brief re #16 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Campbell, Max Dotson, Sheffield, Alabama, City of, Ricky Terry. (Hyde, Robbie)
September 27, 2021 Filing 16 MOTION to Dismiss by Campbell, Max Dotson, Sheffield, Alabama, City of, Ricky Terry. (Hyde, Robbie)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Drake Seal answer due 10/11/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 9/22/21. (BJL)
September 21, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Motion is RIPE 9/21/2021. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Drake Seal. (Debro, John)
September 20, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE OF RETURN OF SERVICE - Drake Seal - first class mail. (BJL)
September 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. The court GRANTS the motion and ORDERS those Defendants to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by September 27, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 9/3/21. (BJL)
September 2, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Motion is RIPE 9/2/2021. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Campbell, Max Dotson, Sheffield, Alabama, City of, Ricky Terry. (Hyde, Robbie)
September 2, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by James Irby on behalf of Ricky Terry (Irby, James)
August 30, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sebastian DeVaughn. Summons and complaint mailed first class mail to Defendant Drake Seal - deemed served 8/30/21. (BJL)
August 27, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Returned Unexecuted - Refused by Sebastian DeVaughn as to Drake Seal. (BJL)
August 23, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sebastian DeVaughn. Ricky Terry served on 8/16/2021, answer due 9/6/2021. (BJL)
August 23, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Sebastian DeVaughn as to Amos Rowell. "Return to Sender - UTF". (BJL)
August 19, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sebastian DeVaughn. Campbell served on 8/16/2021, answer due 9/6/2021; Drake Seal served on 8/16/2021, answer due 9/6/2021; Sheffield, Alabama, City of served on 8/16/2021, answer due 9/6/2021; Max Dotson served on 8/16/21, answer due 9/6/21. (BJL)
August 12, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to All Defendants by Clerk for service via certified mail. (BJL)
August 11, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial(AHI)
August 9, 2021 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Sebastian DeVaughn. (KAM)
August 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Campbell, Amos Rowell, Drake Seal, Sheffield, Alabama, City of, Ricky Terry, filed by Sebastian DeVaughn.(KAM)
August 9, 2021 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3900139 (B4601115091). related document #1 COMPLAINT against Campbell, Amos Rowell, Drake Seal, Sheffield, Alabama, City of, Ricky Terry, filed by Sebastian DeVaughn.(KAM). (Sherrod, Henry) Modified on 8/10/2021 (AHI).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DeVaughn v. Sheffield, Alabama, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sebastian DeVaughn
Represented By: Henry F Sherrod, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheffield, Alabama, City of
Represented By: Robbie Alexander Hyde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ricky Terry
Represented By: James Irby
Represented By: Robbie Alexander Hyde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drake Seal
Represented By: John Mark Debro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amos Rowell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Campbell
Represented By: Robbie Alexander Hyde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Max Dotson
Represented By: Robbie Alexander Hyde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?