Stallworth v. NFI Interactive Logistics LLC, et al.
Plaintiff: Shayanna C. Stallworth
Defendant: NFI Interactive Logistics LLC a corporation doing business as NFI Transportation doing business as NFI National Freight Inc and Vincent Ezra Tutt, Jr.
Case Number: 3:2021cv01382
Filed: October 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Liles C Burke
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2021 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Vincent Ezra Tutt, Jr. filed by Vincent Ezra Tutt, Jr (Lewis, Richard)
November 29, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Vincent Ezra Tutt, Jr.(Lewis, Richard)
November 17, 2021 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by NFI Interactive Logistics LLC. filed by NFI Interactive Logistics LLC (Lewis, Richard)
November 17, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand by NFI Interactive Logistics LLC.(Lewis, Richard)
November 8, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed Vincent Ezra Tutt, Jr no date given with signature(AHI)
November 2, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed NFI Interactive Logistics LLC served on 10/27/2021, answer due 11/17/2021. (AHI)
October 21, 2021 Filing 4 Summons Issued by the clerk and delivered via certified mail for service as to NFI Interactive Logistics LLC and Vincent Ezra Tutt, Jr. (AHI)
October 19, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Shayanna C. Stallworth. filed by Shayanna C. Stallworth (DiLorenzo, Heidi)
October 19, 2021 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Shayanna C. Stallworth. (DiLorenzo, Heidi)
October 19, 2021 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number 1126-3945978 (B4601116440). related document #1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against NFI Interactive Logistics LLC filed by Shayanna C. Stallworth.(AHI). (DiLorenzo, Heidi) Modified on 10/20/2021 (AHI).
October 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT WITH JURY DEMAND against NFI Interactive Logistics LLC filed by Shayanna C. Stallworth.(AHI)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stallworth v. NFI Interactive Logistics LLC, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shayanna C. Stallworth
Represented By: Heidi Abbott DiLorenzo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NFI Interactive Logistics LLC a corporation doing business as NFI Transportation doing business as NFI National Freight Inc
Represented By: Richard W Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vincent Ezra Tutt, Jr.
Represented By: Richard W Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?