Mobley v. Cosby et al
Plaintiff: Jaime C. Mobley
Defendant: Roy E. Cosby and Nunley Trucking
Case Number: 3:2022cv00467
Filed: April 13, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Liles C Burke
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Tort/Motor Vehicle (
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER: Certain time limits and deadlines apply as set out in this order; An in-person Status Conference is set for 2/21/2023 09:00 AM in John McKinley Federal Building, Florence, AL; Discovery due by 4/10/2023; Dispositive Motions due by 5/12/2023. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 4/22/2022. (AHI)
April 21, 2022 Filing 4 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Brannan, James)
April 18, 2022 Filing 3 Defendant Roy Cosby's ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Roy E. Cosby.(Brannan, James)
April 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Liles C Burke on 4/14/2022. (AHI)
April 13, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nunley Trucking from Circuit Court of Colbert County, Alabama, case number 20-cv-2021-900281.00 filed by Nunley Trucking. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(AHI)
April 13, 2022 ANSWER to Complaint filed in state court on 2/8/2022 by Nunley Trucking.(AHI)
April 13, 2022 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 402, receipt_number AALNDC-4060467 (B4601119636). related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nunley Trucking from Circuit Court of Colbert County, Alabama, case number 20-cv-2021-900281.00 filed by Nunley Trucking. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D)(AHI). (Brannan, James) Modified on 4/14/2022 (AHI).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mobley v. Cosby et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaime C. Mobley
Represented By: Bradford J Griffin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roy E. Cosby
Represented By: James B Brannan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nunley Trucking
Represented By: James B Brannan, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?