Teele v. Alabama, State of
Defendant: Alabama, State of
Petitioner: Trenton G Teele
Case Number: 3:2022cv01031
Filed: August 15, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Referring Judge: Nicholas A Danella
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 4, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING - The petition is deficient for the reasons indicated within. Teele must file an amended petition in accordance with the above instructions, within 30 days of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nicholas A Danella on 10/4/2022. (Attachments: #1 2254 Petition) (MEB2)
September 8, 2022 Filing 3 NOTICE of Change of Address by Trenton G Teele. (JLC)
August 17, 2022 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE regarding case number. (KAM)
August 15, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5. Rec# H-41), filed by Trenton G Teele.(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Teele v. Alabama, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Trenton G Teele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alabama, State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?