Mansell and Associates, LLC v. Ritchey Metals Company, Incorporated
Plaintiff: Mansell and Associates, LLC
Defendant: Ritchey Metals Company, Incorporated
Case Number: 3:2022cv01169
Filed: September 12, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Herman N Johnson
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2022 Filing 15 MOTION to Stay , or Alternatively, to Transfer by Mansell and Associates, LLC. (Tanner, J)
November 9, 2022 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Mansell and Associates, LLC. (Tanner, J)
November 3, 2022 Filing 13 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge filed by Ritchey Metals Company, Incorporated, AND Mansell and Associates, LLC (AHI)
October 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Plaintiff's response to the motion to dismiss is due within 14 days of the entry date of this order; any reply is due within 7 days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 10/27/2022. (AHI)
October 26, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss by Ritchey Metals Company, Incorporated. (Wolfe, Kary)
October 4, 2022 Filing 10 RESPONSE in Opposition re #3 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Mansell and Associates, LLC. (Tanner, J)
October 4, 2022 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Mansell and Associates, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Tanner, J) Modified on 10/4/2022 (SBA).
October 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER: The Court GRANTS the #7 Motion for Leave to Appear PHV for Patrick W. Carothers. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 10/3/2022. (AHI)
September 30, 2022 Filing 7 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Patrick W. Carothers Motion is RIPE 9/30/2022. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by Ritchey Metals Company, Incorporated. (Wolfe, Kary)
September 30, 2022 PHV Fee paid: $ 75, receipt number AALNDC-4181668 (ALNCCA23-00001). (Wolfe, Kary) Modified on 10/4/2022 (AHI).
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The parties are required to enter an election regarding the exercise of jurisdiction by a magistrate judge no later than November 3, 2022; in the absence of consent by all parties, the Clerk is directed to reassign the case to a randomly drawn district judge without further order after November 3, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 9/20/2022. (AHI)
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: The Court SETS a Telephone Status Conference for 10/20/2022 at 9:30 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 9/20/2022. (AHI)
September 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER: Plaintiff shall file a response to the #3 motion to dismiss within 14 days of the entry date of this order. Defendant shall file any reply within 7 days thereafter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 9/20/2022. (AHI)
September 19, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION to Dismiss by Ritchey Metals Company, Incorporated. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to MTD, #2 Exhibit B to MTD)(Wolfe, Kary)
September 19, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Assignment of Case to a United States Magistrate Judge for Trial (AHI)
September 12, 2022 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Ritchey Metals Company, Incorporated from the Circuit Court of Colbert County, Alabma, case number 20-cv-2022-900164 filed by Ritchey Metals Company, Incorporated.(SPT )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mansell and Associates, LLC v. Ritchey Metals Company, Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mansell and Associates, LLC
Represented By: Douglas B Hargett
Represented By: G Rick Hall
Represented By: J Michael Tanner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ritchey Metals Company, Incorporated
Represented By: Clyde Ellis Brazeal, III
Represented By: Kary B Wolfe
Represented By: Patrick W Carothers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?