Mancil v. Nintendo of America, Inc Featured Case

Plaintiff: Carla Mancil
Defendant: Nintendo of America, Inc
Case Number: 4:2007cv00922
Filed: May 16, 2007
Court: Alabama Northern District Court
Office: Middle Office
County: Etowah
Presiding Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 16, 2007 6 Opinion or Order of the Court
ORDER OF DISMISSAL in accordance with the 5 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal, the court hereby ORDERS that this action is DISMISSD WITH PREJUDICE, the parties are to bear their own costs, expenses and attorney's fees. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 7/16/2007. (KSS, )
July 13, 2007 5
MOTION to Dismiss by Carla Mancil. (Miceli, David)
May 22, 2007 4 Opinion or Order of the Court
ALND UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS reminding parties of their obligations under FRCP26(f) and LR26.1(d)- with appendices attached. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 5/22/2007. (KSS, )
May 16, 2007 3
NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Nintendo of America, Inc. (KSS, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mancil v. Nintendo of America, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nintendo of America, Inc
Represented By: Gray M Borden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carla Mancil
Represented By: David F Miceli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?