Peoples v. Corizon Health Services et al
Plaintiff: Robert Peoples
Defendant: William Talley, Corizon Health Services and Colleen Oakes
Miscellaneous: staff attorney
Case Number: 4:2011cv03464
Filed: September 26, 2011
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Office: Middle Office
County: St. Clair
Presiding Judge: John E Ott
Presiding Judge: Inge P Johnson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 7, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Senior Judge Inge P Johnson on 7/7/2014. (AVC)
September 24, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND ACCEPTING RECOMMENDATIONS Court EXPRESSLY FINDS no genuine issues of material fact with regard to pla's Eighth Amendment medical claims against Corizon Inc, Dr. William Talley, Nurse Colleen Oakes, and Nurse Anissa Thom as; dfts' motion for summary judgment is GRANTED as to these claims and DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE; motion is DENIED as to pla's Eighth Amendment excessive force claim against Nurse Anissa Thomas; dft Thomas is ORDERED to file an answer w/i 20 days; case is referred back to Magistrate Judge John Ott for further pretrial proceedings. Signed by Senior Judge Inge P Johnson on 9/24/13. (ASL)
August 13, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER ADOPTING REPORT AND ACCEPTING RECOMMENDATIONS that all pla's claims in this action except his Eighth Amendment medical care claims against Corizon Health Services, Dr. Tally, Health Director Oakes, and Nurse Thomas are DISMISSED; pla's Eighth Amendment medical care claims against Corizon, Talley, Oakes, and Thomas are REFERRED to the magistrate judge for further proceedings. Signed by Judge Inge P Johnson on 8/10/12. (ASL)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Peoples v. Corizon Health Services et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Talley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corizon Health Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Colleen Oakes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Miscellaneous: staff attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Peoples
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?