Brothers et al v. Saag

Plaintiff: Sharon J. Stargell Brothers and Paschal Paul Brothers
Defendant: Andy Saag
Case Number: 4:2013cv00466
Filed: March 8, 2013
Court: Alabama Northern District Court
Office: Middle Office
County: Marshall
Presiding Judge: Virginia Emerson Hopkins
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
December 19, 2014 43 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 12/19/2014. (JLC)
March 4, 2014 23 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 13 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, 13 GRANTING MOTION to Strike the Affidavit of William McCaffrey as to all conclusions stated in the affidavit. Those st atements are STRICKEN. The motion is otherwise DENIED. The plaintiffs' petition to "Quash the Motion to Strike the Affidavit of William McCaffrey" (doc. 16 at 8-10) is DENIED; The plaintiffs' petition to strike Exhibit F attache d to the defendants motion to dismiss (doc. 16 at 10- 13) is GRANTED. Exhibit F is STRICKEN; GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 18 MOTION for Judicial Notice of Undisputed Facts and GRANTING 21 Plaintiff's Petition to Strike the Defendant's Latest Reply Brief and the Attached Exhibits A,B and C. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 3/4/2014. (JLC)
August 23, 2013 11 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER STRIKING 9 MOTION for Summary Judgment, GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 7 MOTION to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 7/23/2013.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brothers et al v. Saag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andy Saag
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon J. Stargell Brothers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paschal Paul Brothers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?