Brannon et al v. Gadsden, City of et al

Plaintiff: Kimberly L. Brannon, Charles Cantrell, Joseph R. Dubose, Ricky L. Hunter, Dustin A. Loyd, Jason L. Lynn, Erica Snow and Roy Myers
Defendant: Gadsden, City of, Attalla, City of, Lenesha Zaner and Etowah County Court Referral Program, LLC
Case Number: 4:2013cv01229
Filed: July 1, 2013
Court: Alabama Northern District Court
Office: Middle Office
County: Etowah
Presiding Judge: Virginia Emerson Hopkins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
May 20, 2015 70 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER SEVERING LAWSUIT. The claims of Plaintiffs Kimberly L. Brannon, Joseph R. DuBose, Dustin A. Loyd, Jason L. Lynn, Erica Snow, and Roy Myers (the "Gadsden Plaintiffs") are HEREBY SEVERED from the claims of Plai ntiffs Charles Cantrell, Ricky L. Hunter, and Dustin A. Loyd (the "Attalla Plaintiffs"). Further, the Clerk is HEREBY DIRECTED to assign a new civil action case number to the severed claims of the Attalla Plaintiffs as set out herein. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 5/20/2015. (JLC)
March 10, 2015 62 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 47 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint, GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART 48 MOTION to Dismiss as set out herein. Plaintiffs are HEREBY GRANTED unt il April 9, 2015, to replead only their plausible claims in a non-shotgun format. Finally, the Stay previously in place is HEREBY LIFTED, and the parties are HEREBY ORDERED to meet and file their Report of Parties' Planning Meeting no later than April 30, 2015. Amended Pleadings due by 4/9/2015. Rule 26 Meeting Report due by 4/30/2015. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 3/10/2015. (JLC, )
December 4, 2013 40 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER FINDING AS MOOT 24 MOTION to Dismiss, GRANTING IN PART and TERMED as MOOT IN PART 26 MOTION to Dismiss, GRANTING 28 MOTION to Stay Pending Disposition of Motion to Dismiss, TERMED as MOOT 37 MOTIO N for Joinder. Finally, Plaintiffs are HEREBY GRANTED until January 31, 2014, to replead only their plausible claims in a nonshotgun format and to address the other concerns raised in this Memorandum Opinion. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 12/4/2013. (JLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brannon et al v. Gadsden, City of et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly L. Brannon
Represented By: Charles J Lorant
Represented By: Vincent Francis Saylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Cantrell
Represented By: Charles J Lorant
Represented By: Vincent Francis Saylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph R. Dubose
Represented By: Charles J Lorant
Represented By: Vincent Francis Saylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ricky L. Hunter
Represented By: Charles J Lorant
Represented By: Vincent Francis Saylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin A. Loyd
Represented By: Charles J Lorant
Represented By: Vincent Francis Saylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason L. Lynn
Represented By: Charles J Lorant
Represented By: Vincent Francis Saylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erica Snow
Represented By: Charles J Lorant
Represented By: Vincent Francis Saylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roy Myers
Represented By: Charles J Lorant
Represented By: Vincent Francis Saylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gadsden, City of
Represented By: Bradley W Cornett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attalla, City of
Represented By: Bradley W Cornett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lenesha Zaner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Etowah County Court Referral Program, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?