Wilborn v. Tuten et al

Plaintiff: Don Mitchell Wilborn
Defendant: Robert B Tuten and Tuten Law Offices
Case Number: 4:2016cv00106
Filed: January 21, 2016
Court: Alabama Northern District Court
Office: Middle Office
County: XX US, Outside State
Presiding Judge: Karon O Bowdre
Referring Judge: John H England
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 12, 2017 35 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION VACATING the Court's previous 31 Memorandum Opinion and 32 Order, GRANTING 33 MOTION for Leave to File and Request to Supplement Response to Order to Show Cause. The Court concludes that the Plaintiff's objections are due to be, and hereby are OVERRULED. Further, once again, the Magistrate's 23 Order (doc. 23) is hereby ADOPTED as the opinion of this Court. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 7/12/2017. (JLC)
June 26, 2017 31 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 6/26/2017. (JLC)
May 22, 2017 27 Opinion or Order of the Court MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 5/22/2017. (JLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wilborn v. Tuten et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Don Mitchell Wilborn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert B Tuten
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tuten Law Offices
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?