The Estate of Jerri Gast v. Wells Fargo Bank NA
Plaintiff: The Estate of Jerri Gast
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank NA
Case Number: 4:2018cv01432
Filed: September 4, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John E Ott
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 2, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 2, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TEXT ORDER granting Plaintiff's motion for an extension of time to file a response. #8 Plaintiff's response is due by 10/10/2018 and defendant's reply is due by 10/22/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E. Ott on 10/02/2018.(Ott, John)
September 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL ORDER; Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 9/28/2018. (BST, )
September 26, 2018 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Motion to Extend Response Deadline Motion is RIPE 9/26/2018. Any party may file a motion to reconsider within three (3) business days of a ruling on the motion.Filed by The Estate of Jerri Gast. (Knowles, Christie)
September 26, 2018 Filing 7 CONSENT to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge by The Estate of Jerri Gast, Wells Fargo Bank NA. (BST, )
September 25, 2018 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Christie D Knowles on behalf of The Estate of Jerri Gast (Knowles, Christie)
September 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER regarding compliance with Rule 26; Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 9/18/18. (BST, )
September 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER the parties are reminded that this case will be reassigned to a district judge after 10/26/2018 unless they unanimously consent to the jurisdiction of the undersigned magistrate; Telephone Conference set for 10/11/2018 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge John E Ott; parties call as directed; if all parties submit an executed consent before 10/11/2018, the telephone conference will be cancelled. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 9/17/2018. (KAM)
September 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT SUBMISSION ORDER re #2 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. Plaintiff shall file any opposition or other response to the motion to dismiss by 9/26/2018; Defendant may reply thereto by 10/3/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E. Ott on 9/12/2018. (SJB)
September 11, 2018 Filing 2 MOTION to Dismiss and Brief in Support Thereof by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Rummage, Ryan)
September 4, 2018 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wells Fargo Bank NA from Circuit Court Etowah County, case number 2018-145 WHR., filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(TLM, )
September 4, 2018 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3165924. related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Wells Fargo Bank NA from Circuit Court Etowah County, case number 2018-145 WHR., filed by Wells Fargo Bank NA. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A, # 2 Exhibit B)(TLM, ). (Rummage, Ryan) NDAL rec # b4601091727 Modified on 9/5/2018 (KAM, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Estate of Jerri Gast v. Wells Fargo Bank NA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Estate of Jerri Gast
Represented By: Jacob A Millican
Represented By: Christie D Knowles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank NA
Represented By: Ryan Sikes Rummage
Represented By: Reid S Manley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?