Jackson v. Sand Mountain Broadcasting Service Inc

Plaintiff: Melanie Jackson
Defendant: Sand Mountain Broadcasting Service Inc
Case Number: 4:2018cv01683
Filed: October 15, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Karon O Bowdre
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 29:203
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 13, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 13, 2018 Filing 5 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Epperson, Morgan)
November 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 4 INITIAL ORDER Governing All Further Proceedings - with appendices attached. **The report also should contain a synopsis of the case advising the court of the general claims and defenses of the parties. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 11/6/2018. (FNC)
November 5, 2018 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sand Mountain Broadcasting Service Inc. filed by Sand Mountain Broadcasting Service Inc (Blair, Gordon)
November 5, 2018 Filing 2 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Sand Mountain Broadcasting Service Inc.(Blair, Gordon)
October 26, 2018 Filing Fee received in the amount of $400.00, Credit Card receipt_number 1126-3204475, NDAL receipt #B4601093043. (Pittman, Timothy) Modified on 10/26/2018 (JLC).
October 15, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sand Mountain Broadcasting Service Inc, filed by Melanie Jackson.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Sand Mountain Broadcasting Service Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sand Mountain Broadcasting Service Inc
Represented By: Morgan Pike Epperson
Represented By: Gordon L Blair
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melanie Jackson
Represented By: Timothy P Pittman
Represented By: Charlotte C Christian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?