Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Old Towne Tavern Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Defendant: Mitchell Brown, Kim Brown and Old Towne Tavern Corp.
Case Number: 4:2018cv01932
Filed: November 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Virginia Emerson Hopkins
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 47:605
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 28, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 28, 2018 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Kim Brown, Mitchell Brown, Old Towne Tavern Corp., returned to Plaintiff's attorney for service on this the 28th day of November, 2018. (JLC)
November 28, 2018 Filing 4 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Gamble, F.)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER REGARDING RULE 7.1. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 05/11/2016. (KWC)
November 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 UNIFORM INITIAL ORDER - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Virginia Emerson Hopkins on 11/27/2018. (KWC)
November 27, 2018 Filing Fee received from F. Gamble in the amount of $400.00, credit card receipt_number 1126-3224953; USDC receipt number B4601093705; related document #1 COMPLAINT against Kim Brown, Mitchell Brown, Old Towne Tavern Corp., filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KWC). (Gamble, F.) Modified on 11/27/2018 (KWC)
November 26, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kim Brown, Mitchell Brown, Old Towne Tavern Corp., filed by Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(KWC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Old Towne Tavern Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kim Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Towne Tavern Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc.
Represented By: F. Page Gamble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?