Joe Hand Promotions Inc v. Wedgworth
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions Inc
Defendant: Randy Wedgworth and Point at Val Monte, The
Case Number: 4:2018cv01933
Filed: November 23, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: John E Ott
Nature of Suit: Cable/Satellite TV
Cause of Action: 28:1338
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR WAIVER of Service sent to Jonathan W. Cartee on 12/11/2018 by Joe Hand Promotions Inc. Waiver of Service due by 1/10/2019. (Gamble, F.)
November 28, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to The Point at Val Monte, Randy Wedgworth, returned to Plaintiff's attorney for service on this the 28th day of November, 2018. (JLC)
November 28, 2018 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Joe Hand Promotions Inc (Gamble, F.)
November 27, 2018 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3224957. related document #1 COMPLAINT against Randy Wedgworth, filed by Joe Hand Promotions Inc.(KAM). (Gamble, F.) ALND rec# B4601093706 (KAM, ).
November 23, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Randy Wedgworth, filed by Joe Hand Promotions Inc.(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Joe Hand Promotions Inc v. Wedgworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe Hand Promotions Inc
Represented By: F. Page Gamble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Wedgworth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Point at Val Monte, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?