Slater v. Gadsden Health Care Center Inc et al
Plaintiff: Summer Slater
Defendant: Prohealth Group Inc, U S Health Care LLC, Gadsden Health Care Center Inc, Prohealth Group Inc doing business as Gadsden Health & Rehab Center and Gadsden Health Care Center Inc doing business as Gadsden Health & Rehab Center
Case Number: 4:2018cv02063
Filed: December 14, 2018
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2019 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by U S Health Care LLC. filed by U S Health Care LLC (Miller, Shannon)
February 11, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by U S Health Care LLC.(Miller, Shannon)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER: granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time. The defendants answer is due on or before on or before February 11, 2019. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 1/14/2019. (TLM, )
January 11, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading by U S Health Care LLC. (Miller, Shannon)
December 28, 2018 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Summer Slater. Prohealth Group Inc served on 12/28/2018, answer due 1/18/2019. (TLM, )
December 26, 2018 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Summer Slater. U S Health Care LLC served on 12/26/2018, (TLM, )
December 21, 2018 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Summer Slater. Gadsden Health Care Center Inc served on 12/21/2018, (TLM, )
December 19, 2018 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to U S Health Care LLC, Gadsden Health Care Center Inc, Prohealth Group Inc. mailed certified mail (TLM, )
December 17, 2018 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Summer Slater. (Leonard, Heather)
December 17, 2018 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number B4601094160. related document #1 COMPLAINT against U S Health Care LLC, Gadsden Health Care Center Inc, Prohealth Group Inc, filed by Summer Slater. (Attachments: # 1 Exhbiit A, # 2 Exhibit B, # 3 Exhibit C, # 4 Exhibit D, # 5 Exhbit E)(TLM, ). (Leonard, Heather) Modified on 12/17/2018 (TLM, ).
December 14, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against U S Health Care LLC, Gadsden Health Care Center Inc, Prohealth Group Inc, filed by Summer Slater. (Attachments: #1 Exhbiit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhbit E)(TLM, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Slater v. Gadsden Health Care Center Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prohealth Group Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U S Health Care LLC
Represented By: Shannon L Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gadsden Health Care Center Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prohealth Group Inc doing business as Gadsden Health & Rehab Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gadsden Health Care Center Inc doing business as Gadsden Health & Rehab Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Summer Slater
Represented By: Heather N Leonard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?