Sparks v. Ally Financial, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Lisa Sparks and Durlyn Sparks
Defendant: Ally Financial, Inc. and United Auto Delivery and Recovery Inc
Case Number: 4:2019cv00035
Filed: January 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Karon O Bowdre
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15:1692
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time for Defendants' to file responsive pleadings to the Amended Complaint. The Defendants' responsive pleadings are now due on or before March 22, 2019. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 3/8/19. (MMW)
March 8, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Ally Financial, Inc., United Auto Delivery and Recovery Inc. (Stanford, Jud)
March 1, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Lisa Sparks, Durlyn Sparks as to United Auto Delivery and Recovery Inc. (Unclaimed) (JLC)
February 1, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Lisa Sparks, Durlyn Sparks.(Hubbard, John)
February 1, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lisa Sparks. Ally Financial, Inc. served on 1/28/2019, answer due 2/18/2019. (JLC)
January 24, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Ally Financial, Inc. and United Auto Delivery and Recovery Inc. via certified U.S. Mail on this the 24th day of January, 2019. (JLC)
January 8, 2019 Filing Fee received in the amount of $400.00, Credit Card receipt_number 1126-3250597, NDAL receipt #B4601094585. (Seals, W) Modified on 1/9/2019 (JLC).
January 8, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Lisa Sparks. (Hubbard, John)
January 8, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ally Financial, Inc., United Auto Delivery and Recovery Inc, filed by Lisa Sparks. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sparks v. Ally Financial, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Sparks
Represented By: John C Hubbard
Represented By: W Whitney Seals
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Durlyn Sparks
Represented By: John C Hubbard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ally Financial, Inc.
Represented By: Jud C Stanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Auto Delivery and Recovery Inc
Represented By: Jud C Stanford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?