Taylor v. EBSCO Industries Inc

Plaintiff: Felice Taylor
Defendant: EBSCO Industries Inc
Case Number: 4:2019cv00038
Filed: January 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 2/11/19. (SAC )
February 8, 2019 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by EBSCO Industries Inc. filed by EBSCO Industries Inc (Powell, Charles)
February 8, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by EBSCO Industries Inc.(Powell, Charles)
January 22, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Felice Taylor. EBSCO Industries Inc served on 1/18/2019,(TLM, )
January 14, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to EBSCO Industries Inc.mailed certified mail (TLM, )
January 10, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number B4601094678. related document #1 COMPLAINT against EBSCO Industries Inc, filed by Felice Taylor.(TLM, ). (Porter, Adam) Modified on 1/10/2019 (TLM, ).
January 10, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Felice Taylor. (Porter, Adam)
January 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against EBSCO Industries Inc, filed by Felice Taylor.(TLM, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Taylor v. EBSCO Industries Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EBSCO Industries Inc
Represented By: Charles A Powell, IV
Represented By: Katherine Suttle Weinert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felice Taylor
Represented By: Adam M Porter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?