Atangana v. Whitaker et al

Petitioner: Lionel Roussel Atangana
Respondent: Hassel, David Rivera, Matthew Whitaker and Kirstjen Nielsen
Case Number: 4:2019cv00058
Filed: January 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Referring Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for an Order to Show Cause by Lionel Roussel Atangana. (KAM)
February 13, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Virginia Lum on behalf of Respondents (Lum, Virginia) Modified on 2/13/2019 to correct the party represented) (KAM).
February 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Petitioner shall show cause in writing within 30 days to clarify whether he intended to file two habeas petitions, whether he intended to abandon his New Jersey petition, or whether he was under the mistaken impression that the New Jersey habeas petition had been dismissed; the briefing in this case is STAYED pending the response of the petitioner. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 2/11/2019. (KAM)
February 8, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Order to Show Cause as to duplicative habeas petitions, MOTION to Stay briefing on the habeas pending further order of the Court by Hassel, Kirstjen Nielsen, David Rivera, Matthew Whitaker. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: District of New Jersey Habeas Docket)(Marshall, Mary)
January 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE the Respondents shall show cause in writing within 21 days why the relief requested by the petitioner should not be granted; Show Cause Response due by 2/8/2018.. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 1/18/2019. (KAM)
January 10, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5. Rec B4601094660), filed by Lionel Roussel Atangana.(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atangana v. Whitaker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Hassel
Represented By: Virginia Lum
Represented By: Mary Lester Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: David Rivera
Represented By: Virginia Lum
Represented By: Mary Lester Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matthew Whitaker
Represented By: Virginia Lum
Represented By: Mary Lester Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kirstjen Nielsen
Represented By: Virginia Lum
Represented By: Mary Lester Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Lionel Roussel Atangana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?