Sanders v. Berryhill

Plaintiff: Linda Sanders
Defendant: Nancy A Berryhill
Case Number: 4:2019cv00235
Filed: February 8, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Linda Sanders. Nancy A Berryhill served on 4/2/2019, answer due 6/1/2019. (TLM, )
March 26, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Shannon Kathleen Fishel on behalf of Nancy A Berryhill (Fishel, Shannon)
March 4, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Nancy A Berryhill, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General del to USM(TLM, )
February 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER - Plaintiff has submitted a Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis. (Doc. #2 ). The court finds that Plaintiff is indigent, and the Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis is hereby GRANTED. The Clerk is DIRECTED to file this action without prepayment of a fee. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 2/22/2019. (KEK)
February 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE that counsel for the plaintiff is required to provide the social security number of the plaintiff to the US Attorney's Office within 10 days. The notice is to be given to the US Attorney outside of the electronic filing. (TLM, )
February 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Nancy A Berryhill, filed by Linda Sanders.(TLM, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sanders v. Berryhill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Sanders
Represented By: Myron K Allenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nancy A Berryhill
Represented By: Shannon Kathleen Fishel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?