White v. HMR of Alabama Inc
Plaintiff: Krissy White
Defendant: HMR of Alabama Inc
Case Number: 4:2019cv00246
Filed: February 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. HMR of Alabama Inc responsive pleading due 4/17/2018. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 3/28/2019. (KMG)
March 27, 2019 Filing 6 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by HMR of Alabama Inc. (Redmond, Wesley)
March 12, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Krissy White. HMR of Alabama Inc served on 3/7/2019, answer due 3/28/2019. (JLC)
March 4, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to HMR of Alabama Inc. (TLM, ) (TLM, ).
February 12, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number B4601095375 related document #1 COMPLAINT against HMR of Alabama Inc, filed by Krissy White.(TLM, ). (Arnold, Allen) Modified on 2/12/2019 (TLM, ).
February 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Krissy White (TLM, )
February 11, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Krissy White. (TLM, )
February 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against HMR of Alabama Inc, filed by Krissy White.(TLM, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: White v. HMR of Alabama Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HMR of Alabama Inc
Represented By: Wesley C Redmond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Krissy White
Represented By: Allen Durham Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?