Eidson v. Albertville Auto Acquistions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sharon Eidson
Defendant: Sandra Tidwell, Albertville Auto Acquistions, Inc. and Nissan of Albertville
Case Number: 4:2019cv00459
Filed: March 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Karon O Bowdre
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING #15 MOTION to Permit Limited Discovery on the Enforceability of the Arbitration Agreement. The parties may conduct discovery limited to the issues outlined in Plaintiffs' Motion for 60 days. The parties shall file a Joint Status Report on or before August 19, 2019. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 6/17/2019. (JLC)
May 17, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION TO PERMIT LIMITED DISCOVERY ON THE ENFORCEABILITY OF THE ARBITRATION AGREEMENT by Sharon Eidson. (Yearout, Jason) Modified on 5/17/2019 (JLC).
May 16, 2019 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action filed by Sharon Eidson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Yearout, Jason)
May 7, 2019 Filing 13 JOINDER in re #7 Motion to Compel Arbitration filed by Sandra Tidwell. (Smythe, Gage)
May 7, 2019 Filing 12 Evidentiary Material re: #7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action Exhibit B. (Smythe, Gage)
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 TEXT ORDER: The court GRANTS "Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Respond to Defendant's Motion to Stay Action and Compel Arbitration." (Doc. 10). Plaintiff's response is now due on or before May 16, 2019. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 05/01/2019. (LMG)
April 30, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by Sharon Eidson. (Yearout, J)
April 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Plaintiff Sharon Eidson is hereby ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE in writing, on or before May 2, 2019, why the Court should not compel arbitration and stay this case during the course of arbitration. Signed by Chief Judge Karon O Bowdre on 4/18/2019. (JLC)
April 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Gage Cooper Smythe on behalf of Sandra Tidwell (Smythe, Gage)
April 16, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Action by Albertville Auto Acquistions, Inc., Nissan of Albertville. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Greg Harden)(Smythe, Gage)
April 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey L Ingram on behalf of Albertville Auto Acquistions, Inc., Sandra Tidwell (Ingram, Jeffrey)
April 4, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Sharon Eidson. Albertville Auto Acquistions, Inc. served on 4/1/2019, answer due 4/22/2019; Sandra Tidwell served on 4/1/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. (JLC)
March 28, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Albertville Auto Acquistions, Inc. and Sandra Tidwell via certified U.S. Mail on this the 28th day of March, 2019. (JLC)
March 28, 2019 Filing 3 Request for service by certified mail filed by Sharon Eidson. (Yearout, Jason)
March 20, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Sharon Eidson. (Yearout, Jason)
March 19, 2019 Filing Fee received in the amount of $400.00, receipt number B4601096178. (JLC)
March 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Albertville Auto Acquistions, Inc., Nissan of Albertville, Sandra Tidwell, filed by Sharon Eidson. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eidson v. Albertville Auto Acquistions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sandra Tidwell
Represented By: Gage Cooper Smythe
Represented By: Jeffrey L Ingram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Albertville Auto Acquistions, Inc.
Represented By: Gage Cooper Smythe
Represented By: Jeffrey L Ingram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan of Albertville
Represented By: Gage Cooper Smythe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon Eidson
Represented By: J Gusty Yearout
Represented By: Sigfredo Rubio
Represented By: Jason L Yearout
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?