Reese v. The Guardian

Plaintiff: Abbia Reese
Defendant: The Guardian
Case Number: 4:2019cv00521
Filed: April 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Referring Judge: Corey L Maze
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DISMISSING CASE: in accordance with the stipulation of the parties, this action is DISMISSED with prejudice; parties to bear their own costs. Signed by Judge Corey L Maze on 7/1/2019. (SRD)
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 STIPULATION of Dismissal JOINT by Abbia Reese. filed by Abbia Reese (Allenstein, Myron)
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: Case reassigned to Judge Corey L Maze. Judge Annemarie Carney Axon no longer assigned to the case. (KAM)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL ORDER IN ERISA BENEFITS CASES - On or before August 1, 2019, the parties SHALL file a joint report, under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 26(f), as set out within. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 6/5/19. (SAC )
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TEXT ORDER - The court entered its general Initial Order in error; #4 Initial Order is hereby VACATED; Initial Order in ERISA Benefits Cases will be filed on the docket and is to REPLACE #4 Initial Order. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 6/5/19. (SAC )
April 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ** VACATED PER 5/TEXT ORDER; see instead #6 ** INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 4/11/19. (SAC ) Modified on 6/5/2019 (SAC ).
April 11, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by The Guardian.(Wahlheim, William)
April 3, 2019 Filing Fee received from William B Wahlheim Jr. in the amount of $400.00, credit card receipt_number 1126-3315417; USDC receipt number B4601096497; related document #1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Guardian from Circuit Court of Etowah County, case number 31-cv-2019-900137.00, filed by The Guardian.(TLM) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/3/2019: # 1 Exhibit) (TLM) (Wahlheim, William) Modified on 4/4/2019 (KWC)
April 2, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by The Guardian (TLM, )
April 2, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by The Guardian from Circuit Court of Etowah County, case number 31-cv-2019-900137.00. (), filed by The Guardian.(TLM, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 4/3/2019: #1 Exhibit) (TLM, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Reese v. The Guardian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Guardian
Represented By: Grace Robinson Murphy
Represented By: William B Wahlheim, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abbia Reese
Represented By: Rose Marie Allenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?