Hawkins v. Drug Enforcement Agency et al (INMATE 1)

Plaintiff: Jeffery Lee Hawkins
Defendant: Deputy Sentell, Detective Green, Sgt. Estes, Drug Enforcement Agency and Jeremy Stepps
Case Number: 4:2019cv00572
Filed: April 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Office: Middle Office
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Referring Judge: John H England
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Before the undersigned is the plaintiff's request for a copy of his complaint. #10 . The Clerk is DIRECTED to send a copy of the complaint to the plaintiff. The plaintiff is ADVISED he will be required to pay for any additional copies of his complaint or other documents. There is a charge of $ 0.50 per page for copying documents and copying charges must be paid in advance. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 6/27/2019. (PSM)
June 26, 2019 Filing 10 Request for a copy of the complaint by Jeffery Lee Hawkins. (JLC)
June 12, 2019 Filing fee: $ 350.00, receipt number B4601098396 (PSM)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER terming motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis, plaintiff is required to pay a partial filing fee, plaintiff is required to return signed attached consent form within 30 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 5/13/2019. (PSM)
May 10, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION (Application) for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis w/ attachment by Jeffery Lee Hawkins. (KWC)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENT PLEADING The plaintiff's application to proceed in forma pauperis is deficient for the reasons indicated within. #3 . The plaintiff must correct the deficient pleading within thirty (30) days from the entry date of this Order, in the manner explained within. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 4/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application)(PSM)
April 15, 2019 Filing 6 Case transferred in from District of Alabama Middle; Case Number 2:19-cv-00197. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 15, 2019 Case transferred to Northern District of Alabama; Electronically transferred via CM/ECF to Clerk. (No pdf attached to this entry) (kr, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 4/15/2019.]
April 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 OPINION AND ORDER: it is ORDERED that: 1. The Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge is ADOPTED; 2. This case is transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Alabama; 3. The #3 application to proceed without prepayment of fees is left for resolution after transfer; DIRECTING the Clerk to take the appropriate steps to effectuate the transfer of this case; This case is closed in this court. Signed by Honorable Judge W. Harold Albritton, III on 4/15/2019. (kr, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 4/15/2019.]
April 11, 2019 No objections filed to the #4 Recommendation. (No pdf attached to this entry) (kr, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 4/15/2019.]
March 22, 2019 Filing 4 RECOMMENDATION OF THE MAGISTRATE JUDGE: it is the RECOMMENDATION of the Magistrate Judge that this case be transferred to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Alabama pursuant to the provisions of 28 USC 1406(a); Objections to R&R due by 4/5/2019. Signed by Honorable Judge Charles S. Coody on 3/22/2019. (kr, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 4/15/2019.]
March 20, 2019 Filing 3 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees and Affidavit by Jeffery Lee Hawkins. (kr, ) [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 4/15/2019.]
March 20, 2019 Filing 2 MEMORANDUM of Law in Support re #1 Inmate 1983 Complaint filed by Jeffery Lee Hawkins. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(es, ) (Attachment 1 replaced on 3/22/2019 to remove IFP page for docket purposes) (qc/djy, ). [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 4/15/2019.]
March 20, 2019 Filing 1 Inmate 1983 COMPLAINT against Drug Enforcement Agency, Sgt. Estes, Detective Green, Deputy Sentell, Jeremy Stepps, filed by Jeffery Lee Hawkins.(es, ) Modified on 3/22/2019 to remove no IFP language and docket IFP (qc/djy, ). [Transferred from Alabama Middle on 4/15/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hawkins v. Drug Enforcement Agency et al (INMATE 1)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery Lee Hawkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Sentell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Detective Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sgt. Estes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Drug Enforcement Agency
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeremy Stepps
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?