Whorton v. Globe Life & Accident Ins Co

Plaintiff: Thomas C Whorton
Defendant: Globe Life & Accident Ins Co
Case Number: 4:2019cv00694
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Because the court holds an independent obligation to determine whether subject matter jurisdiction exists, the court must be assured that the amount in controversy requirement has been met before allowing the case to proceed. Accordingly, the court ORDERS Defendant to show cause, in writing, on or before July 19, 2019, why the court should not remand this case for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 7/1/2019. (KEK)
June 17, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Pennington, Michael)
June 6, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Counterclaim by Thomas C Whorton.(Colbert, Timothy)
May 7, 2019 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number B4601097460. (KEK)
May 7, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) , COUNTERCLAIM for Declaratory Judgment against Thomas C Whorton by Globe Life & Accident Ins Co. (Pennington, Michael)
May 7, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Globe Life & Accident Ins Co. filed by Globe Life & Accident Ins Co (Pennington, Michael)
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Globe Life & Accident Ins Co from Circuit Court of Cherokee County, Alabama, case number 13-cv-2019-900053, filed by Globe Life & Accident Ins Co. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibt B)(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whorton v. Globe Life & Accident Ins Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Globe Life & Accident Ins Co
Represented By: Kriston Laney Gifford
Represented By: Michael R Pennington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas C Whorton
Represented By: Timothy Corey Colbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?