Hernandez v. Warden

Defendant: Warden and William Barr
Petitioner: Jose Alberto Hernandez
Case Number: 4:2019cv00746
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Referring Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 9 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by William Barr. (Marshall, Mary)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying without prejudice #7 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 7/9/2019. (KWC)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Jose Alberto Hernandez. (JLC)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 REPLY to Respondent's #4 Motion For Extension filed by Jose Alberto Hernandez. (KWC)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Motion for Extension of Time. The motion is GRANTED to the extent the respondent shall have an additional thirty (30) days from the entry date of this order to respond to the show cause order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 6/10/2019. (PSM)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time by William Barr. (Marshall, Mary)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Lester Marshall on behalf of William Barr (Marshall, Mary)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE This is an action on a petition for writ of habeas corpus brought pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 by Jose Alberto Hernandez. It is hereby ORDERED that the respondent appear and SHOW CAUSE in writing within twenty-one (21) days from the entry date of this Order, why the relief requested by petitioner should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 5/17/2019. (PSM)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Jose Alberto Hernandez; Filing fee paid by Jose Alberto Hernandez in the amount of $5.00, receipt number B4601097751.(KWC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez v. Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Represented By: Mary Lester Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jose Alberto Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?