Love v. Harris et al
Plaintiff: Crystal Celeste Love
Defendant: Jonathan D Cooper, Saint Joseph Mercy Hospital - Eureka, Frank H Pacoe, California Board of Nursing and Kamala D Harris
Case Number: 4:2019cv00761
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Madeline Hughes Haikala
Referring Judge: Corey L Maze
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Judge Corey L Maze on 7/11/2019. (SRD)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying #2 Motion to Appoint Attorney and granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge Corey L Maze on 7/11/2019. (SRD)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT: Case Reassigned to Judge Corey L Maze from the Unassigned Judge A civil cases. (KAM)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE - exhibit to #1 Complaint by Crystal Celeste Love. (KWC)
June 12, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Change of Address by Crystal Celeste Love. (KWC)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION to Appoint Attorney and MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis with attachments by Crystal Celeste Love. (KWC) Modified on 5/21/2019: Documents restricted to protect plaintiff's personal identifying information. (YMB).
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against California Board of Nursing, Jonathan D Cooper, Kamala D Harris, Frank H Pacoe, Saint Joseph Mercy Hospital - Eureka, filed by Crystal Celeste Love. (Attachments: #1 Exhibits)(KWC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Love v. Harris et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Crystal Celeste Love
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan D Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saint Joseph Mercy Hospital - Eureka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank H Pacoe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Board of Nursing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kamala D Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?