Verges v. WKW Erbsloeh North America LLC
Plaintiff: Michael W Verges
Defendant: WKW Erbsloeh North America LLC
Case Number: 4:2019cv00900
Filed: June 11, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:2000
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3373453 (ALND B4601098560) related document #1 COMPLAINT against WKW Erbsloeh North America LLC, filed by Michael W Verges. (Attachments: # 1 EEOC Charge)(KEK). (Cooks, Roderick) Modified on 6/20/2019 (KEK).
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 TEXT ORDER This matter is before the court on Plaintiff's failure to pay the filing fee. On or before June 26, 2019, Plaintiff shall pay the filing fee or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis. If Plaintiff does not comply with this order, the court may dismiss this case for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 6/19/19. (SAC )
June 11, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against WKW Erbsloeh North America LLC, filed by Michael W Verges. (Attachments: #1 EEOC Charge)(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Verges v. WKW Erbsloeh North America LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WKW Erbsloeh North America LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael W Verges
Represented By: Charity Gilchrist-Davis
Represented By: Lee David Winston
Represented By: Roderick T Cooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?