Mena-Nunez v. Horton
Petitioner: Nelvy R Mena-Nunez
Respondent: Jonathon W Horton and William P Barr
Case Number: 4:2019cv00921
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Referring Judge: John H England
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 9, 2019 Filing 8 STATUS REPORT by William P Barr. filed by William P Barr (Marshall, Mary)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER - A recent search for the petitioner in the U.S. Immigration and Custom Enforcements online detainee locator system yielded no results, which leads the undersigned to believe that the petitioner may no longer be in ICE custody. Respondents are therefore ORDERED to file a status report including the petitioners custody status by August 9, 2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 8/2/2019. (KEK)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER - Petitioner has twenty-one (21) days from the date of this order to respond. Thereafter, the petition will be taken under advisement by the Court, and the undersigned will enter a report and recommendation without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 7/15/2019. (KEK)
July 15, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by William P Barr. filed by William P Barr (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pitman Declaration, #2 Exhibit Burgess Declaration)(Marshall, Mary)
July 15, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Lester Marshall on behalf of William P Barr (Marshall, Mary)
July 15, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Lester Marshall on behalf of William P Barr (Marshall, Mary) Modified on 7/15/2019 (KEK). ***Respondent filed in error***
June 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; The Respondent is hereby ORDERED to APPEAR and SHOW CAUSE in writing, within thirty (30) days, why the relief requested by the Petitioner should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 6/14/2019. (JLC)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5, receipt number ALND B4601098457), filed by Nelvy R Mena-Nunez. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support and Exhibits)(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mena-Nunez v. Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Nelvy R Mena-Nunez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Jonathon W Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William P Barr
Represented By: Mary Lester Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?