Nyang v. Warden Etowah County Jail
Petitioner: Shiekh Amadou Nyang
Respondent: Warden Etowah County Jail and William P Barr
Case Number: 4:2019cv00929
Filed: June 17, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Herman N Johnson
Referring Judge: Abdul K Kallon
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 7 RESPONSE to re #5 filed by Shiekh Amadou Nyang. (KAM)
July 15, 2019 Motion of respondents treating response #5 as a motion for summary judgment pursuant to #6 .. (AFS)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER that the court deems this case ripe for summary disposition, the petitioner shall have 20 days to supply an additional evidentiary materials; thereafter the court will take the petition under advisement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 7/15/2019. (AFS)
July 8, 2019 Filing 5 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by William P Barr. filed by William P Barr (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Pitman Declaration)(Marshall, Mary)
July 8, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Lester Marshall on behalf of William P Barr (Marshall, Mary)
June 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. Respondent is ORDERED to appear and show cause in writing within 20 days from the date of entry of this order why the relief requested by the petitioner should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Herman N Johnson, Jr on 6/18/2019. (AFS)
June 17, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Shiekh Amadou Nyang. (AFS)
June 17, 2019 Filing 1 VERIFIED PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus and Complaint for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief, filed by Shiekh Amadou Nyang.(AFS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nyang v. Warden Etowah County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Shiekh Amadou Nyang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Warden Etowah County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William P Barr
Represented By: Mary Lester Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?