Benton v. Monsanto Company
Plaintiff: Gerald Wade Benton
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Case Number: 4:2019cv00976
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Karon O Bowdre
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Transferring Case to MDL No. 2741; ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the Northern District of California for inclusion in MDL No. 2741; Copies of docket entries and documents requested by transferee clerk electronically mailed to Clerk of Court in the Northern District of California. (JLC)
August 7, 2019 Filing 2 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Gerald Wade Benton. Monsanto Company waiver sent on 8/2/2019, answer due 10/1/2019. (Brandt, Christine)
June 25, 2019 Filing Fee received in the amount of $400.00, Credit Card receipt_number 1126-3377402, NDAL receipt #B4601098655. (Brandt, Christine) Modified on 6/25/2019 (JLC).
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Monsanto Company, filed by Gerald Wade Benton. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(JLC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benton v. Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald Wade Benton
Represented By: Christine C Brandt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Monsanto Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?