Hernandez v. Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) et al
Petitioner: Jose Alberto Hernandez
Respondent: Unit Chief, Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security (DHS), ICE/ERO Director and Director of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (ICE)
Case Number: 4:2019cv01016
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Referring Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Nature of Suit: Mandamus & Other
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2019 Filing 12 RESPONSE to re #9 Order to Show Cause dated July 2, 2019 filed by Director of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (ICE), ICE/ERO Director, Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security (DHS). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration)(Marshall, Mary)
July 10, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Consolidate Cases by Director of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (ICE), ICE/ERO Director, Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security (DHS), Unit Chief. (Marshall, Mary)
July 10, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Mary Lester Marshall on behalf of Director of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (ICE), ICE/ERO Director, Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security (DHS), Unit Chief (Marshall, Mary)
July 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER This is an action on a petition for a writ of habeas corpus filed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 by Jose Alberto Hernandez. Petitioner has paid the filing fee. It is ORDERED that the respondents appear and SHOW CAUSE in writing within twenty-one (21) days from the entry date of this Order why the relief requested by Petitioner should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Staci G Cornelius on 7/2/2019. (PSM)
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of California Southern; Case Number 3:19-cv-00894. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
June 27, 2019 Filing 7 Case transferred to District of Northern District of Alabama. Files transferred electronically to: *District of Northern District of Alabama*.*1729 Fifth Avenue North, Room 140**Birmingham, AL 35203-2000*. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 6/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Transfer Order) (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ag) (jao). [Transferred from California Southern on 6/28/2019.]
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 RETURN TO PETITION by Director of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (ICE), ICE/ERO Director, Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security (DHS). (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Proof of Service)(Bettwy, Samuel)(jms). [Transferred from California Southern on 6/28/2019.]
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: Respondents are Ordered to Show Cause why the Petition should not be granted by: (1) filing a written return no later than 6/13/2019; (2) filing copies of all documents, orders and transcripts relevant to the petition; and, (3) filing a memorandum of law and fact fully stating Respondents' position and making a recommendation regarding the need for an evidentiary hearing on the Petition. Petitioner may file a traverse no later than 6/20/2019. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 6/3/2019.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ag) [Transferred from California Southern on 6/28/2019.]
May 29, 2019 Filing 4 Fee for Habeas Petition: Paid on 5/29/2019. (jms) (jms). [Transferred from California Southern on 6/28/2019.]
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER Denying #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. This action is dismissed without prejudice to Petitioner to pay the filing fee or submit adequate proof of his inability to do so on or before 7/15/2019. Signed by Judge William Q. Hayes on 5/14/2019. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(ag) [Transferred from California Southern on 6/28/2019.]
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Jose Alberto Hernandez. (jms) (jao). [Transferred from California Southern on 6/28/2019.]
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus against Director of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (ICE), ICE/ERO Director, Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security (DHS), Unit Chief, filed by Jose Alberto Hernandez.($5 Filing Fee, Fee Not Paid, IFP Filed) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)The new case number is 3:19-cv-894-WQH-JLB. Judge William Q. Hayes and Magistrate Judge Jill L. Burkhardt are assigned to the case.(jms)(jao). [Transferred from California Southern on 6/28/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hernandez v. Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Unit Chief
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Represented By: Mary Lester Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Secretary of the Department of Homeland Security (DHS)
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Represented By: Mary Lester Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: ICE/ERO Director
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Represented By: Mary Lester Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Director of U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement (ICE)
Represented By: U S Attorney CV
Represented By: Mary Lester Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jose Alberto Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?