Whitmore v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Plaintiff: Randy Whitmore
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Case Number: 4:2019cv01149
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Dalton Windham on behalf of Social Security Administration, Commissioner (Windham, Robert)
August 12, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Randy Whitmore. Social Security Administration, Commissioner served on 8/12/2019, answer due 11/11/2019. (JLC)
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General- del USM for service. (KWC)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 TEXT ORDER granting #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge L. Scott Coogler on July 22, 2019. (ABN)
July 22, 2019 TEXT NOTICE that counsel for the plaintiff is required to provide the social security number of the plaintiff to the US Attorney's Office within 10 days. The notice is to be given to the US Attorney outside of the electronic filing system. (PSM)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Randy Whitmore. (PSM)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, Commissioner, filed by Randy Whitmore.(PSM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Whitmore v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Randy Whitmore
Represented By: Myron K Allenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Represented By: Robert Dalton Windham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?