Loyd v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Plaintiff: Renay Loyd
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Case Number: 4:2019cv01209
Filed: July 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: R David Proctor
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 10, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Renay Loyd. Social Security Administration, Commissioner served on 8/27/2019, answer due 11/26/2019. (KAM)
August 15, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration, Commissioner, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General del to USM (KAM)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ORDER This matter is before the court on Plaintiff's Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #2 . The motion #2 is GRANTED. Plaintiff is hereby granted leave to proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Judge R David Proctor on 7/30/2019. (KAM)
July 29, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE that counsel for the plaintiff is required to provide the plaintiff's social security number to the US Attorney's Office within 10 days. This notice is to be made outside of the electronic filing system. (KAM)
July 29, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Renay Loyd. (KAM)
July 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, Commissioner, filed by Renay Loyd.(KAM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Loyd v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renay Loyd
Represented By: Myron K Allenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration, Commissioner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?