Delgado v. Hubbell Power Systems Inc
Plaintiff: Jose Christian Tovar Delgado
Defendant: Hubbell Power Systems Inc
Case Number: 4:2019cv01218
Filed: July 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Nature of Suit: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 2601
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 23, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 INITIAL ORDER GOVERNING ALL FURTHER PROCEEDINGS - with appendices attached. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 9/23/19. (SAC)
September 20, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hubbell Power Systems Inc. filed by Hubbell Power Systems Inc (Davis, Thomas)
September 20, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Hubbell Power Systems Inc.(Davis, Thomas)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's responsive pleading is due on or before September 20, 2019. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 9/5/2019.(KMG)
September 5, 2019 Filing 8 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint (Unopposed) by Hubbell Power Systems Inc. (Davis, Thomas)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 TEXT ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendant's responsive pleading is due on September 6, 2019. Signed by Judge Annemarie Carney Axon on 8/21/2019. (KMG)
August 21, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Plaintiff's Complaint by Hubbell Power Systems Inc. (Davis, Thomas)
August 7, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jose Christian Tovar Delgado. Hubbell Power Systems Inc. served on 8/2/2019, answer due 8/23/2019. (JLC)
July 31, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Hubbell Power Systems Inc. Sent via certified mail. (KEK)
July 31, 2019 Filing 3 CONFLICT DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Jose Christian Tovar Delgado. (KEK)
July 31, 2019 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Jose Christian Tovar Delgado. (KEK)
July 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Hubbell Power Systems Inc, filed by Jose Christian Tovar Delgado.(KEK)
July 31, 2019 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3401761 (ALND B4601099478) related document #1 COMPLAINT against Hubbell Power Systems Inc, filed by Jose Christian Tovar Delgado.(KEK). (Arnold, Allen) Modified on 7/31/2019 (KEK).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Delgado v. Hubbell Power Systems Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hubbell Power Systems Inc
Represented By: Thomas A Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Christian Tovar Delgado
Represented By: Allen Durham Arnold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?