Ghotra v. MacLean et al
Petitioner: Kulvinder Singh Ghotra
Respondent: William P Barr, Kevin MacLean, David Rivera and Scott Hassell
Case Number: 4:2019cv01498
Filed: September 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: L Scott Coogler
Referring Judge: John E Ott
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 7, 2019 Filing 9 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to Kulvinder Singh Ghotra (KAM)
October 25, 2019 Filing 8 Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail #5 sent to Kulvinder Singh Ghotra (AKD)
October 15, 2019 Filing 7 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION For the reasons stated above, the undersigned RECOMMENDS Respondent's motion to dismiss the petition as moot #6 , be GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 10/15/2019. (PSM)
October 7, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION to Dismiss as Moot by William P Barr, Kevin MacLean. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Attachment)(Cheek, Jason)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #4 MOTION for Extension of Time, Respondents are allowed until October 18, 2019, in which to file a Response to the Order to Show Cause. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 10/1/2019. (JLC)
October 1, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #2 Order to Show Cause, dated September 12, 2019 by William P Barr, Kevin MacLean. (Cheek, Jason)
September 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason R Cheek on behalf of William P Barr, Kevin MacLean, David Rivera (Cheek, Jason)
September 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER This is an action on a petition for a writ of habeas corpus filed pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 by Kulvinder Singh Ghotra.Petitioner has paid the filing fee. It is hereby ORDERED that the respondents appear and show cause in writing, within twenty (20) days from the entry date of this Order, why the relief requested by Petitioner should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge John E Ott on 9/12/2019. (PSM)
September 9, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5. rec# B4601100497), filed by Kulvinder Singh Ghotra.(KAM) (KAM, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ghotra v. MacLean et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Kulvinder Singh Ghotra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William P Barr
Represented By: Jason R Cheek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Kevin MacLean
Represented By: Jason R Cheek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: David Rivera
Represented By: Jason R Cheek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Scott Hassell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?