Pell City, Alabama, City of v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Plaintiff: Pell City, Alabama, City of
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, McKesson Corporation, Purdue Pharma LP, Mallinckrodt LLC, Mallinckrodt PLC, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Allergan PLC, Cephalon Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Purdue Pharma Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc, Johnson & Johnson, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD, Cardinal Health Inc, Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Purdue Frederick Company Inc, The, Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc, Noramco Inc, Actavis Inc., Actavis PLS and Watson Pharma Inc
Case Number: 4:2020cv00203
Filed: February 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Staci G Cornelius
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18:1961
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2020 Filing 17 Summons Returned Unexecuted as to Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc. (MRR, )
March 12, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed Endo Health Solutions Inc served on 3/3/2020, answer due 3/24/2020; Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc served on 3/3/2020, answer due 3/24/2020; Mallinckrodt LLC served on 3/3/2020, answer due 3/24/2020. (MRR, )
March 9, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed McKesson Corporation served on 3/2/2020, answer due 3/23/2020; Noramco Inc served on 2/28/2020, answer due 3/20/2020. (MRR, )
March 6, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pell City, Alabama, City of. Actavis LLC served on 3/2/2020, answer due 3/23/2020; Cephalon Inc served on 3/2/2020, answer due 3/23/2020; Johnson & Johnson served on 3/3/2020, answer due 3/24/2020; Purdue Frederick Company Inc, The served on 3/2/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (KEK)
March 5, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Pell City, Alabama, City of. Cardinal Health Inc served on 2/29/2020, answer due 3/21/2020; Watson Laboratories Inc served on 3/2/2020, answer due 3/23/2020. (KEK)
March 4, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation served on 2/28/2020, answer due 3/20/2020; Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc served on 2/28/2020, answer due 3/20/2020; Purdue Pharma LP served on 2/28/2020, answer due 3/20/2020. (MRR, )
March 4, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc served on 2/28/2020, answer due 3/20/2020; Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc served on 2/28/2020, answer due 3/20/2020. (MRR, )
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Transferring Case to MDL: ORDER of Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation transferring this case to the District of Northern Ohio for inclusion in MDL; certified copy of docket entries and documents requested by transferee clerk sent to Clerk of Court in District of Northern Ohio. (MRR, )
March 2, 2020 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed Actavis Pharma Inc served on 2/28/2020, answer due 3/20/2020; Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc served on 2/28/2020, answer due 3/20/2020. (MRR, )
February 26, 2020 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Purdue Frederick Company Inc, The, Purdue Pharma LP, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc, Watson Laboratories Inc, Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc., sent via certified mail (MRR, )
February 26, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Johnson & Johnson, Mallinckrodt LLC, McKesson Corporation, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc, Purdue Pharma Inc., sent via certified mail (MRR, )
February 26, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Cephalon Inc, Endo Health Solutions Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc, Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc., sent via certified mail (MRR, )
February 26, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Actavis LLC, Actavis Pharma Inc, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health Inc, Noramco Inc., sent via certified mail (MRR, )
February 14, 2020 Filing Fee: Filing fee $ 400, receipt_number 1126-3536315. related document #1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Pell City, Alabama, City of.(MRR, ). (Sutton, William)
February 14, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE REGARDING CONSENT to magistrate judge jurisdiction (MRR, )
February 14, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Corporate Disclosure by Pell City, Alabama, City of (MRR, )
February 14, 2020 Filing 2 Request for service by certified mail filed by Pell City, Alabama, City of. (MRR, )
February 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Pell City, Alabama, City of.(MRR, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pell City, Alabama, City of v. Purdue Pharma LP et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKesson Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Pharma Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Purdue Frederick Company Inc, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharmaceuticals Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis PLS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pell City, Alabama, City of
Represented By: Rhon E Jones
Represented By: Jon Ryan Kral
Represented By: Jere L Beasley
Represented By: Richard D Stratton
Represented By: William Robert Sutton
Represented By: Jeffrey Donald Price
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?