Khorshed v. Barr
Petitioner: Alam Khorshed
Respondent: William Barr
Case Number: 4:2020cv00444
Filed: March 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Alabama
Presiding Judge: Annemarie Carney Axon
Referring Judge: John H England
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER notifying Petitioner that the Respondents filed a #9 Response to the #1 Petition in the above-styled case in which they seek to have the Petition summarily dismissed without an evidentiary hearing and to further inform the Petitioner of his right to file affidavits or other materials in opposition to the response and of the possible consequences of not responding. Petitioner shall have twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Order to respond. Thereafter, the petition will be taken under advisement by the Court, and the undersigned will enter a Report and Recommendation without further notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 5/18/2020. (JLC)
May 18, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE in Opposition re #7 MOTION for Extension of Time filed by William Barr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bryan S. Pitman)(Richardson, Clinton)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 TEXT ORDER granting #7 Motion for Extension of Time. Respondent's answer to the show cause order is due May 18, 2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H. England, III on 05/07/2020. (CLS2)
May 7, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time by William Barr. (Richardson, Clinton)
April 24, 2020 Filing 6 Mail Returned as Undeliverable (released from facility). Mail sent to Alam Khorshed (Doc 2). (KEK)
April 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Clinton Richardson on behalf of William Barr (Richardson, Clinton)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER - On April 10, 2020, the United States Postal Service returned an order to show cause that the undersigned had sent the petitioner. (Doc. #3 ). The envelope contains the hand-written message: "Released From This Facility 04/02/2020." (Id.). However, a recent search for the petitioner in the U.S. Immigration and Custom Enforcement's online detainee locator system indicates the petitioner was not released, but transferred to Jena/LaSalle Detention Facility in Jena, Louisiana. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 4/10/2020. (KEK)
April 10, 2020 Filing 3 Mail Returned as Undeliverable (released 4/2/2020). Mail sent to Petitioner (case number). (KEK)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Accordingly, it is ORDERED that Respondent appear and show cause in writing within thirty (30) days, why the relief requested by Petitioner should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge John H England, III on 4/8/2020. (KEK)
March 31, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus (Filing fee $ 5, receipt number ALND B4601105087), filed by Alam Khorshed.(KEK)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Alabama Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Khorshed v. Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William Barr
Represented By: Clinton Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Alam Khorshed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?